Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Costanzo Zani, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Imola, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1622¹Born
12 Sep 167250.6AppointedBishop of Imola, Italy
18 Sep 167250.7Ordained BishopBishop of Imola, Italy
16 Jun 169472.4DiedBishop of Imola, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Costanzo Zani
Bishop Costanzo Zani O.S.B. (born 1622, died ) Bishop of Imola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 227
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1672, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast