Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Costa

Deceased

Bishop of Sagone (Sagona), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1650Born
25 Feb 167322.9Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jun 168838.2AppointedBishop of Sagone (Sagona), France
20 Jun 168838.2Ordained BishopBishop of Sagone (Sagona), France
15 Aug 171464.4DiedBishop of Sagone (Sagona), France

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Costa
Bishop Giovanni Battista Costa (born , died ) Bishop of Sagone (Sagona)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova

  • a priest for 41.4 years
  • a bishop for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 339
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1688, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018