Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Verde

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vico Equense, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1630¹Born
14 Jan 168858.0AppointedBishop of Vico Equense, Italy
20 Jun 168858.4Ordained BishopBishop of Vico Equense, Italy
19 May 170070.3ResignedBishop of Vico Equense, Italy
21 Jan 170676.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Vico Equense, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Verde
Bishop Francesco Verde (born 1630, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vico Equense

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Antonio

  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 413
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,688, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast