Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso de Aloysio

Deceased

Bishop of Squillace


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1644BornMontelparo
3 May 167834.3Ordained PriestPriest
31 May 168844.4AppointedBishop of Squillace, Italy
13 Jun 168844.4Ordained BishopBishop of Squillace, Italy
May 1694³50.3DiedBishop of Squillace, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso de Aloysio:
Bishop Alfonso de Aloysio (born , died May 1694) Bishop of Squillace

  • a priest for 15.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 363
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1688, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 25 Apr 2015