Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro de Torres

Deceased

Archbishop of Trani


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1634BornTrani
1 Aug 166025.6Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jan 166530.0AppointedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
24 Jan 168954.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Potenza, Italy
24 Mar 169459.2SelectedArchbishop of Trani, Italy
24 Jan 169560.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Trani, Italy
Oct 1709³74.8DiedArchbishop of Trani, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro de Torres:
Archbishop Pietro de Torres (born , died Oct 1709) Archbishop of Trani

  • a priest for 49.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 323, and Page 385
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 291
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1665, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 24 Apr 2015