Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Baldassarre Nosadini

Deceased

Bishop of Krk (Veglia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1648BornVenetiis
31 May 168840.4AppointedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
8 Jun 168840.4Ordained BishopBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
Jul 171264.5DiedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Baldassarre Nosadini:
Bishop Baldassarre Nosadini Bishop of Krk (Veglia)

  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 406

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013