Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Alfonso Petrucci

Deceased

Bishop of Belcastro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1650³BornCutri
23 Dec 167323.0Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jul 168635.5AppointedBishop of Belcastro, Italy
28 Jul 168635.6Ordained BishopBishop of Belcastro, Italy
Jan 1688²37.0DiedBishop of Belcastro, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Alfonso Petrucci:
Bishop Giovanni Alfonso Petrucci (born , died Jan 1688) Bishop of Belcastro

  • a priest for 14.0 years
  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 116
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1686, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 22 Apr 2015