Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Antonio d’Alessandro

Deceased

Bishop of San Marco (Argentano)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1628BornZalatone
8 Mar 165324.7Ordained PriestPriest
31 May 168859.9AppointedBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy
8 Jun 168860.0Ordained BishopBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy
28 Sep 169365.3DiedBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Antonio d’Alessandro:
Bishop Pietro Antonio d’Alessandro (born , died ) Bishop of San Marco (Argentano)

  • a priest for 40.5 years
  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 255
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1688, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 24 Apr 2015