Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrea de Rossi, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Rossano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1644BornSerre
31 May 168843.8AppointedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
8 Jun 168843.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
30 Oct 169652.2DiedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea de Rossi:
Archbishop Andrea de Rossi C.R. (born , died ) Archbishop of Rossano

  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 335
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1688, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 24 Apr 2015