Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Porrata

Deceased

Bishop of Noli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1622³BornVoltri
7 Jul 168764.7AppointedBishop of Noli, Italy
13 Jul 168764.7Ordained BishopBishop of Noli, Italy
Sep 1699³76.8DiedBishop of Noli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Porrata:
Bishop Giacomo Porrata (born , died Sep 1699) Bishop of Noli

  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 280
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1687, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 23 Apr 2015