Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Muzio Dandini

Deceased

Bishop of Senigallia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1634BornCaesenaten
1 Apr 168651.4AppointedBishop of Senigallia, Italy
15 Apr 168651.4Ordained BishopBishop of Senigallia, Italy
7 Aug 171277.7DiedBishop of Senigallia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Muzio Dandini:
Bishop Muzio Dandini (born , died ) Bishop of Senigallia

  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 353

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013