Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Rasponi

Deceased

Bishop of Forli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1646¹BornRavenna
27 Feb 168943.1Ordained PriestPriest
28 Feb 168943.1AppointedBishop of Forli, Italy
20 Mar 168943.2Ordained BishopBishop of Forli, Italy
31 Aug 171468.6DiedBishop of Forli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Rasponi:
Bishop Giovanni Rasponi (born 1646, died ) Bishop of Forli

  • a priest for 25.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 204
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1689, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 26 Apr 2015