Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Gomoliński

Deceased

Bishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1663BornGnesnen
30 Mar 170037.2AppointedBishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine
16 Apr 170037.3Ordained BishopBishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine
Sep 171451.7DiedBishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Jan Gomoliński:
Bishop Jan Gomoliński Bishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow)

  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 232

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013