Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mikołaj Popławski

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1636BornNovomiasten
15 Jan 168548.1AppointedBishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland
25 Feb 168548.2Ordained BishopBishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland
21 Jul 171073.6AppointedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
7 Sep 171174.8DiedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Mikołaj Popławski:
Archbishop Mikołaj Popławski (born , died ) Archbishop of Lviv

  • a bishop for 26.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 243, and Page 408

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013