Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Konstantyn Józef Zieliński

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1646³BornPrasnen
1671¹24.9Ordained PriestPriest
30 Aug 169448.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
30 Aug 169448.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria
7 Nov 169448.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria
30 Mar 170054.2AppointedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
17 Feb 170963.0DiedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Konstantyn Józef Zieliński:
Archbishop Konstantyn Józef Zieliński (born , died ) Archbishop of Lviv

  • a priest for 38.1 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,250
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 220, and Page 242
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1694, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015