Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcin Załuski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Płock

Titular Bishop of Rosmen (Russionen)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1655³BornNamystovien
13 Aug 169640.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland
13 Aug 169640.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Rosmen (Russionen)
30 Sep 169640.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rosmen (Russionen)
2 May 171054.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Marcin Załuski:
Bishop Marcin Załuski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Płock

  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,379
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 335
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1696, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015