Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Roncovieri

Deceased

Bishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1642Born
29 Dec 168644.1Ordained PriestPriest
28 May 170057.5AppointedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
31 May 170057.5Ordained BishopBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
31 May 171168.5DiedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Roncovieri
Bishop Alessandro Roncovieri (born , died ) Bishop of Borgo San Donnino

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiacenza

  • a priest for 24.4 years
  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 131
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1700, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018