Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephen Robson

Bishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1951 Born
17 Mar 197927.9Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain
8 May 201261.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain
8 May 201261.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tunnuna
9 Jun 201261.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tunnuna
11 Dec 201362.6AppointedBishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain
9 Jan 201462.7InstalledBishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Stephen Robson (VIAF: 2190389)
Bishop Stephen Robson (born ) Bishop of Dunkeld

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarlisle, Cumbria, Diocese of Lancaster, England
Ordained PriestOur Lady and St. Joseph, Church, Carlisle, Cumbria, Diocese of Lancaster, England
Ordained BishopSt. Mary, Cathedral, Edinburgh, Lothian, Archdiocese of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Dunkeld.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 May 2012
  • ob: CB, 8 May 2012
  • c2+: CB, 11 May 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,443
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Dec 2013
  • i: CB, 12 Dec 2013
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast