Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop James Beaton

Deceased

Archbishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1473¹Born
12 May 150835.3AppointedBishop of Whithorn-Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain
19 Jan 150936.0AppointedArchbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
15 Apr 150936.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
10 Oct 152249.7AppointedArchbishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain
14 Feb 153966.1DiedArchbishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James Beaton
Archbishop James Beaton (born 1473, died ) Archbishop of Saint Andrews

EventPlace
Ordained BishopStirling
Death PlaceSaint Andrews, Archdiocese of Saint Andrews, Scotland

  • a bishop for 29.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 150, and Page 203
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 108
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1509, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast