Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Grey Graham

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland

Titular Bishop of Tipasa in Numidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1874BornMaxton
15 Aug 190329.4Converted
22 Dec 190632.7Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain
30 Aug 191743.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain
30 Aug 191743.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tipasa in Numidia
16 Nov 191743.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tipasa in Numidia
31 Mar 193056.0ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain
5 Dec 195985.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Henry Grey Graham
Bishop Henry Grey Graham (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 42.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 370
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 51
  • r: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 3 May 2016