Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Donald Martin

Deceased

Bishop of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1873Born
23 Sep 190531.9Ordained PriestPriest of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain
2 Apr 191945.4AppointedBishop of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain
11 Jun 191945.6Ordained BishopBishop of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain
6 Dec 193865.1DiedBishop of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Donald Martin
Bishop Donald Martin (born , died ) Bishop of Argyll and The Isles

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalen, Acharacle, Argyll, Vicariate Apostolic of Western District, Scotland
Ordained PriestSt. Columba, Cathedral, Oban, Argyll, Diocese of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland
Ordained BishopSt. Columba, Cathedral, Oban, Argyll, Diocese of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland
Death PlaceBishop's House, Oban, Argyll, Diocese of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland
Buried Place (Original)Pennyfuir, Cemetery, Oban, Argyll, Diocese of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland

  • a priest for 33.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1919, Number 38
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast