Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephen McGill, P.S.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Paisley, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1912Born
29 Jun 193624.4Ordained PriestPriest of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
Oct 193624.7IncardinatedPriest of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
4 Apr 196048.2AppointedBishop of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain
22 Jun 196048.4Ordained BishopBishop of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain
25 Jul 196856.5AppointedBishop of Paisley, Scotland, Great Britain
8 Mar 198876.1RetiredBishop of Paisley, Scotland, Great Britain
9 Nov 200593.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Paisley, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Stephen McGill
Bishop Stephen McGill P.S.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Paisley

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCrosshill, Glasgow, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland
Ordained PriestSt. Andrew, Cathedral, Glasgow, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland
Ordained BishopSt. Columba, Cathedral, Oban, Argyll, Diocese of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland
Death PlaceNazareth House, Cardonald, Glasgow, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland
Buried Place (Original)St. Conval, Cemetery, Barrhead, Glasgow, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland

  • a priest for 69.3 years
  • a bishop for 45.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 14,992, Necrology (back)
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 70
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast