Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles McDonald Renfrew

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Glasgow, Scotland

Titular Bishop of Abula


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1929BornGlasgow
4 Apr 195323.7Ordained PriestPriest of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
5 May 197747.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
5 May 197747.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Abula
31 May 197747.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abula
27 Feb 199262.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Charles McDonald Renfrew
Bishop Charles McDonald Renfrew (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Glasgow

  • a priest for 38.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Oct 2016