Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Devine

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Motherwell, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1937Born
29 Jun 196022.8Ordained PriestPriest of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
5 May 197739.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
5 May 197739.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Voli
31 May 197739.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Voli
13 May 198345.7AppointedBishop of Motherwell, Scotland, Great Britain
31 May 201375.8RetiredBishop of Motherwell, Scotland, Great Britain
23 May 201981.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Motherwell, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Devine
Bishop Joseph Devine (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Motherwell

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKirkintilloch, Glasgow, Dunbartonshire, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland
Ordained PriestSt. Andrew, Cathedral, Glasgow, Lanarkshire, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland
Ordained BishopSt. Francis, Church, Glasgow, Lanarkshire, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland
Death PlaceWishaw General, Hospital, Lanarkshire, Diocese of Motherwell, Scotland
Buried Place (Original)Our Lady of Good Aid, Cathedral, Motherwell, Lanarkshire, Diocese of Motherwell, Scotland

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 41.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 31 May 2013
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018
  • d: CB, 23 May 2019
  • d.loc: CL, 25 May 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast