Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Wallace

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Lowland District, Scotland

Titular Bishop of Cyrrhus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1654BornArbroath, Forfarshire
3 Apr 170853.9Ordained PriestPriest
30 Apr 172066.0AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Scotland, Great Britain
30 Apr 172066.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Cyrrhus
21 Sep 172066.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cyrrhus
23 Jul 172773.2AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Lowland District, Scotland, Great Britain
30 Jun 173379.2DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Lowland District, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Wallace:
Bishop John Wallace (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Lowland District

  • a priest for 25.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015