Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Geddes

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Lowland District, Scotland

Titular Bishop of Marocco o Marruecos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1735BornMains of Corridoun, Enzie
10 Mar 175923.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lowland District, Scotland, Great Britain
18 Mar 175923.5Ordained PriestPriest of Lowland District, Scotland, Great Britain
30 Sep 177944.0AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Lowland District, Scotland, Great Britain
30 Sep 177944.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Marocco o Marruecos, Titular Sees
30 Nov 178045.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marocco o Marruecos, Titular Sees
26 Oct 179762.1ResignedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Lowland District, Scotland, Great Britain
11 Feb 179963.4DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Lowland District, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Geddes
Bishop John Geddes (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Lowland District

  • a priest for 39.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 97, Number 502
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1780, Number 38
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 277, and Page 455
  • od/c01: CB, 17 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 18 Feb 2016