Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch François Mattei

Deceased

Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1709BornRoma
19 Sep 173324.0Ordained PriestPriest
28 Mar 175747.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
3 Apr 175747.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
13 Mar 175848.5AppointedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
15 Aug 179484.9DiedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

MicroData Summary for François Mattei
Patriarch François Mattei (born , died ) Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

  • a priest for 60.9 years
  • a bishop for 37.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 75, and Page 183
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1757, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 18 Feb 2016