Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Filippo Josiah Caucci

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Constantinople


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1692BornRoma
19 May 174249.5Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jan 176067.2AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
3 Feb 176067.2Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
15 Feb 177178.2DiedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople

MicroData Summary for Filippo Josiah Caucci:
Patriarch Filippo Josiah Caucci (born , died ) Titular Patriarch of Constantinople

  • a priest for 28.7 years
  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 180
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1760, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015