Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Giuseppe Cornaro (Corner)

Deceased

Bishop of Vicenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1727BornVenezia
10 Aug 175730.2Ordained PriestPriest
31 Mar 175931.8SelectedBishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy
28 May 175932.0ConfirmedBishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy
10 Jun 175932.0Ordained BishopBishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy
6 Apr 176739.8AppointedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
3 Feb 177951.7DiedBishop of Vicenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marco Giuseppe Cornaro (Corner):
Bishop Marco Giuseppe Cornaro (Corner) (born , died ) Bishop of Vicenza

  • a priest for 21.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 410, and Page 441
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015