Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Pasqualigo

Deceased

Bishop of Scardona (Skradin), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1698Born
17 Apr 175657.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Apr 175657.9Ordained PriestPriest
12 Apr 176061.9SelectedBishop of Scardona (Skradin), Italy
21 Apr 176061.9ConfirmedBishop of Scardona (Skradin), Italy
1 Jun 176062.1Ordained BishopBishop of Scardona (Skradin), Italy
14 Apr 176667.9DiedBishop of Scardona (Skradin), Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Pasqualigo
Bishop Domenico Pasqualigo (born , died ) Bishop of Scardona (Skradin)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Gloriosa dei Frari, Basilica, Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}

  • a priest for 9.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 369
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1760, Number 18
  • ob/c34: AT, 9 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 12 Jan 2018