Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Locatelli

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Naples

Titular Archbishop of Cartagine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1713BornMilano, Italy
22 Dec 175946.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
11 Jan 176047.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
27 Jan 176047.0Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jan 176047.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cartagine
3 Feb 176047.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Cartagine
25 Nov 176350.8DiedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Locatelli
Archbishop Giuseppe Locatelli (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Naples

  • a priest for 3.8 years
  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 149
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1760, Number 4
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 248

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016