Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gioacchino Martínez

Deceased

Bishop of Avellino e Frigento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1708³BornSant’Angelo a Fasanella
7 Jun 173224.2Ordained PriestPriest
21 Apr 176052.1AppointedBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
27 Apr 176052.1Ordained BishopBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
21 Feb 178273.9DiedBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gioacchino Martínez:
Bishop Gioacchino Martínez (born , died ) Bishop of Avellino e Frigento

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 111
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1760, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015