Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Colin Cameron Grant

Deceased

Bishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1832Born
22 Dec 185523.8Ordained PriestPriest of Northern District, Scotland, Great Britain
16 Jul 188957.4AppointedBishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain
13 Aug 188957.5Ordained BishopBishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain
26 Sep 188957.6DiedBishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Colin Cameron Grant (VIAF: 11813477)
Bishop Colin Cameron Grant (born , died ) Bishop of Aberdeen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGlen Gairn
Ordained PriestAberdeen, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, Scotland
Ordained BishopAssumption, Cathedral, Aberdeen, Diocese of Aberdeen, Scotland
Death PlaceAberdeen, Diocese of Aberdeen, Scotland
Buried Place (Original)St Mary of the Assumption, Cathedral, Aberdeen, Diocese of Aberdeen, Scotland

  • a priest for 33.7 years
  • a bishop for .1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 69
  • mn: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017