Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri Pelgé

Deceased

Bishop of Poitiers, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1837Born
21 Dec 186124.6Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jan 189456.7SelectedBishop of Poitiers, France
18 May 189457.0ConfirmedBishop of Poitiers, France
15 Jul 189457.1Ordained BishopBishop of Poitiers, France
31 May 191174.0DiedBishop of Poitiers, France

MicroData Summary for Henri Pelgé
Bishop Henri Pelgé (born , died ) Bishop of Poitiers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 454

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017