Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Amiel-François Bessière

Deceased

Bishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1869Born
29 Jun 189222.5Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jan 191747.0AppointedBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria
11 Apr 191747.2Ordained BishopBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria
3 Oct 192353.7DiedBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria

MicroData Summary for Amiel-François Bessière
Bishop Amiel-François Bessière (born , died ) Bishop of Constantine (-Hippone)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Chinian, France

  • a priest for 31.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017