Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas Lhernould

Bishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1975 Born
22 May 200429.1Ordained PriestPriest of Tunis, Tunisia
9 Dec 201944.7AppointedBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria
8 Feb 202044.8Ordained BishopBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria
29 Feb 202044.9InstalledBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Lhernould
Bishop Nicolas Lhernould (born ) Bishop of Constantine (-Hippone)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCourbevoie, Diocese of Nanterre, France
Ordained BishopSaint Vincent de Paul et Sainte Olive, Cathedral, Tunis, Archdiocese of Tunis, Tunisia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Constantine (-Hippone).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Dec 2019
  • ob/i: CB, 23 Dec 2019
  • c2: CB, 7 Jan 2020
  • c34: CB, 8 Feb 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 10 Feb 2020

Quantcast