Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Karl-Josef Cardinal Rauber

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Belgium

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Antonio di Padova a Circonvallazione Appia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1934 BornNürnberg, Germany
28 Feb 195924.8Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
18 Dec 198248.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Iubaltiana
18 Dec 198248.6AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Uganda
6 Jan 198348.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Iubaltiana
22 Jan 199055.7AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy
16 Mar 199358.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
16 Mar 199358.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Liechtenstein
25 Apr 199763.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Hungary
25 Apr 199763.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Moldova, Republic of
22 Feb 200368.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Belgium
22 Feb 200368.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Luxembourg
18 Jun 200975.1RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Belgium
24 Jul 200975.2RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Luxembourg
14 Feb 201580.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Antonio di Padova a Circonvallazione Appia
14 Feb 201580.8Elevated to Cardinal
13 Jun 201581.1InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Antonio di Padova a Circonvallazione Appia

MicroData Summary for Karl-Josef Rauber:
Karl-Josef Cardinal Rauber (born ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Belgium

Please contact the Cardinal through the Nunciature to Belgium.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c: Bollettino, 4 Jan 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Feb 2015
  • i: Bollettino, 9 Jun 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 10 Jun 2015