Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Udo Markus Bentz

Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

Titular Bishop of Sita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1967 Born
1 Jul 199528.3Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
15 Jul 201548.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
15 Jul 201548.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Sita
20 Sep 201548.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sita

MicroData Summary for Udo Markus Bentz
Bishop Udo Markus Bentz (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRülzheim

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mainz.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jul 2015
  • ob/c2/mn: CB, 15 Jul 2015
  • ob: CB, 27 Jul 2015
  • c34: CB, 8 Sep 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,579

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 May 2017