Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Georg Gänswein

Prefect of the Prefecture of the Papal Household

Titular Archbishop of Urbs Salvia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1956 BornWaldshut
19 Dec 198226.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
31 May 198427.8Ordained PriestPriest of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
7 Dec 201256.4AppointedPrefect of the Prefecture of the Papal Household
7 Dec 201256.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Urbs Salvia
6 Jan 201356.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Urbs Salvia

MicroData Summary for Georg Gänswein:
Archbishop Georg Gänswein (born ) Prefect of Prefecture of the Papal Household

Please contact the Archbishop through the Prefecture of the Papal Household.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2012
  • ob/c2: CB, 9 Dec 2012
  • c34: CB, 3 Jan 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,626

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013