Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Reinhold Nann

Prelate of Caravelí, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1960 Born
31 May 198726.7Ordained PriestPriest of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
27 May 201756.7AppointedPrelate of Caravelí, Peru
15 Aug 201756.9Ordained BishopPrelate of Caravelí, Peru
22 Aug 201756.9InstalledPrelate of Caravelí, Peru

MicroData Summary for Reinhold Nann
Bishop Reinhold Nann (born ) Prelate of Caravelí

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBreisach, Archdiocese of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
Ordained BishopCathedral, Trujillo, Archdiocese of Trujillo

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Caravelí.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 May 2017
  • ob/i: CB, 30 May 2017
  • c2+: CB, 4 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Aug 2017