Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Salvador Piñeiro García-Calderón

Archbishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1949 BornLima
6 May 197324.3Ordained PriestPriest of Lima, Peru
21 Jul 200152.5AppointedBishop of Peru, Military
2 Sep 200152.6Ordained BishopBishop of Peru, Military
8 Jul 200354.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lurín, Peru
2006¹56.9ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Lurín, Peru
6 Aug 201162.5AppointedArchbishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga, Peru
30 Oct 201263.8ResignedBishop of Peru, Military

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Salvador Piñeiro García-Calderón:
Archbishop Salvador Piñeiro García-Calderón (born ) Archbishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Ayacucho o Huamanga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Aug 2011
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2006, Page 426
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,039
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Oct 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013