Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Alberto Salcedo Ojeda, O.M.I.

Bishop of Huancavélica, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1960 Born
3 Feb 198928.1ProfessedMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
30 Aug 199332.7Solemn VowsMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
30 Aug 199433.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
6 Jan 199635.1Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
30 Jan 201655.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Huancayo, Peru
30 Jan 201655.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Mattiana
17 Apr 201655.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mattiana
21 May 202160.4AppointedBishop of Huancavélica, Peru
18 Jul 202160.6InstalledBishop of Huancavélica, Peru

MicroData Summary for Carlos Alberto Salcedo Ojeda
Bishop Carlos Alberto Salcedo Ojeda O.M.I. (born ) Bishop of Huancavélica

EventPlace
Birth PlaceComas
Ordained BishopColiseo del Colegio Salesiano Santa Rosa, Huancayo, Archdiocese of Huancayo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Huancavélica.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Jan 2016
  • ob: CB, 29 Feb 2016
  • ob/c2+: CB, 11 Mar 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,895
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 May 2021
  • i: CB, 21 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 22 Jun 2021

Quantcast