Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pedro Ricardo Cardinal Barreto Jimeno, S.J.

Archbishop of Huancayo, Peru

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Pietro e Paolo a Via Ostiense


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1944 Born
18 Dec 197127.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
21 Nov 200157.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Jaén en Peru o San Francisco Javier
21 Nov 200157.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Acufida
1 Jan 200257.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acufida
17 Jul 200460.4AppointedArchbishop of Huancayo, Peru
5 Sep 200460.5InstalledArchbishop of Huancayo, Peru
28 Jun 201874.3Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 201874.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Pietro e Paolo a Via Ostiense

MicroData Summary for Pedro Ricardo Barreto Jimeno (VIAF: 307448120)
Pedro Ricardo Cardinal Barreto Jimeno S.J. (born ) Archbishop of Huancayo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima, Archdiocese of Lima
Ordained BishopSan Pedro, Church, Lima, Archdiocese of Lima

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Huancayo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,093
  • card: Bollettino, 20 May 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 14 Aug 2018

Quantcast