Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilberto Alfredo Vizcarra Mori, S.J.

Vicar Apostolic of Jaén en Peru o San Francisco Javier

Titular Bishop of Autenti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1960 Born
31 Jul 199434.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
15 Aug 200141.5Perpetual VowsPriest of Society of Jesus
11 Jun 201454.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Jaén en Peru o San Francisco Javier
11 Jun 201454.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Autenti
15 Aug 201454.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Autenti

MicroData Summary for Gilberto Alfredo Vizcarra Mori
Bishop Gilberto Alfredo Vizcarra Mori S.J. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Jaén en Peru o San Francisco Javier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Jaén en Peru o San Francisco Javier.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Jun 2014
  • ob/c2+: CB, 13 Jun 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,265

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast