Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augusto Martín Quijano Rodríguez, S.D.B.

Vicar Apostolic of Pucallpa, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1969 Born
31 Jan 199525.8Perpetual VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
22 Nov 199728.7Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
31 Jul 201950.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Pucallpa, Peru
21 Sep 201950.5Ordained BishopVicar Apostolic of Pucallpa, Peru
28 Sep 201950.5InstalledVicar Apostolic of Pucallpa, Peru

MicroData Summary for Augusto Martín Quijano Rodríguez
Bishop Augusto Martín Quijano Rodríguez S.D.B. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Pucallpa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlija, Diocese of Huaraz
Ordained BishopMaría Auxiliadora, Basilica, Lima, Archdiocese of Lima

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Pucallpa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Jul 2019
  • ob/c2: CB, 31 Jul 2019
  • c3+/i: CB, 11 Sep 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 21 Sep 2019

Quantcast