Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Huaraz

Dioecesis Huarazensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 15 May 1899
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Trujillo
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Peru
  • Square Kilometers: 13,819 (5,337 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Obispado, Psje. Antonio Alba 378, Parque Santa Rosa de Lima, Huarez, Ancash, Peru
  • Telephone: (43)422.007

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
15 May 1899ErectedArchdiocese of Lima Diocese of Huaraz (erected)
15 May 1958Territory LostDiocese of Huaraz (Cajatambo)
Archdiocese of Lima (Canta except Santa Rosa de Quives; Parts of Cajatambo)
Diocese of Huacho (erected)
15 May 1958Territory LostDiocese of Huánuco (Marañon)
Diocese of Huaraz (Departamento de Ancash (Hauri, Pomabamba, Mariscal, Luzuriaga, Corongo, and Pallasca))
Territorial Prelature of Huarí (erected)
26 November 1962Territory LostDiocese of Huaraz (Santa and Portions of Casma) Territorial Prelature of Chimbote (erected)
13 June 1966Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Huaraz (from Lima)
22 March 1983Territory LostDiocese of Huaraz (Huarmey in Casma; Pamparomas in Huaylas; Quillo in Yungay; Cochabamba, Colcabamba, Huanchay, Pampas, and Pariacoto in Huaraz) Territorial Prelature of Chimbote

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950645,000650,00099.2%5185910,93212954ap1951
1966254,214256,21499.2%4414584,383222729ap1967
1970302,335.0%3618540253326ap1971
1976291,550297,50098.0%3115466,338203730ap1977
1980283,632298,56095.0%209299,780114428ap1981
1987392,000403,00097.3%2442814,00043228ap1991
1999266,813291,73091.5%3710475,6761134229ap2000
2000271,438312,24086.9%4110515,3221134231ap2001
2001275,953333,19882.8%5010604,5991134830ap2002
2002300,100350,20085.7%5010605,001134930ap2003
2003325,000370,00087.8%4511565,8031284930ap2004
2004350,000390,00089.7%4110516,8621264925ap2005
2006365,000405,80089.9%418497,448214930ap2007
2013220,461389,03156.7%447514,3221223925ap2014
2016227,086432,53352.5%479564,055153926ap2017
2019232,688446,58552.1%497564,155732ap2020
2021234,940367,09664.0%4810584,0501035ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 59, Page 204, and Page 205

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.7, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 23 Jun 2024