Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ezechiel Francisco Soto, SS.CC. †

Deceased

Bishop of Huaraz, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1840Born
27 Feb 190161.1AppointedBishop of Huaraz, Peru
15 Aug 190161.6Ordained BishopBishop of Huaraz, Peru
17 Apr 190363.2DiedBishop of Huaraz, Peru

MicroData Summary for Ezechiel Francisco Soto
Bishop Ezechiel Francisco Soto SS.CC. (born , died ) Bishop of Huaraz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima

  • a bishop for 1.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 310
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018