Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel Tovar y Chamorro

Deceased

Archbishop of Lima, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1844Born
26 May 186622.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lima, Peru
22 Sep 186622.3Ordained PriestPriest of Lima, Peru
4 Jun 189147.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
4 Jun 189147.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Marcopolis
6 Sep 189147.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marcopolis
22 Aug 189854.2AppointedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
8 Dec 189854.5InstalledArchbishop of Lima, Peru
25 May 190763.0DiedArchbishop of Lima, Peru

MicroData Summary for Manuel Tovar y Chamorro (VIAF: 21705220)
Archbishop Manuel Tovar y Chamorro (born , died ) Archbishop of Lima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSayán, Archdiocese of Lima
Ordained BishopSan Pedro, Lima, Archdiocese of Lima

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 343, and Page 366
  • b: LB, 7 Feb 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017