Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mariano Emilio Holguin y Maldonado, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Arequipa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1860BornArequipa
28 Feb 188625.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
12 Aug 190443.8AppointedBishop of Huaraz, Peru
16 Oct 190444.0Ordained BishopBishop of Huaraz, Peru
1 Jun 190645.6AppointedBishop of Arequipa, Peru
23 May 194382.6AppointedArchbishop of Arequipa, Peru
24 Dec 194585.2DiedArchbishop of Arequipa, Peru

MicroData Summary for Mariano Emilio Holguin y Maldonado:
Archbishop Mariano Emilio Holguin y Maldonado O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Arequipa

  • a priest for 59.8 years
  • a bishop for 41.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 52
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 65
  • c3: CB, 4 Aug 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,253

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015