Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Santiago Medina y Bañon

Deceased

Bishop of Trujillo, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1836Born
22 Dec 186024.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lima, Peru
27 Jan 186124.9Ordained PriestPriest of Lima, Peru
14 Feb 188953.0AppointedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
18 Aug 188953.5Ordained BishopBishop of Trujillo, Peru
22 Mar 190771.1DiedBishop of Trujillo, Peru

MicroData Summary for Manuel Santiago Medina y Bañon (VIAF: 232609067)
Bishop Manuel Santiago Medina y Bañon (born , died ) Bishop of Trujillo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima, Archdiocese of Lima
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lima, Archdiocese of Lima

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 569
  • c01: LB, 31 Jan 2013
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017